Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/03/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/20/2004