Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/26/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/26/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/27/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/27/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/05/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/11/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/02/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/04/2004