Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/26/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/26/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/26/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/25/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/10/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/10/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/10/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/25/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/25/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/13/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/13/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/14/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/15/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/13/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/13/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/13/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/13/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/13/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/13/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/13/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 09/13/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/13/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/29/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/30/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/04/2004