Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/26/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/25/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/25/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/27/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/21/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/21/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/05/2003