Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/26/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/26/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/05/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/19/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/08/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/24/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/02/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/09/2004