Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/13/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/09/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/15/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/02/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/02/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/23/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/22/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/11/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/07/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/24/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2004