Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/19/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/20/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/30/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/01/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/10/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/10/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/10/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/10/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/10/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/15/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/21/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/28/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/05/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/20/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew