Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/05/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/05/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/05/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/05/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/27/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/27/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/08/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/20/2003