There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Water Authority Restoration Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to clarify the jurisdiction of the United States over waters of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/28/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2003Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E332)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (138)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/13/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/27/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/03/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/05/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/12/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/05/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/11/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/21/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/11/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/27/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/05/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/03/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/14/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/23/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/18/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/06/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/27/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/28/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.962. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2003)

Clean Water Authority Restoration Act of 2003 - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to replace the term "navigable waters," throughout the Act, with the term "waters of the United States," defined to mean all waters subject to the ebb and flow of the tide, the territorial seas, and all interstate and intrastate waters and their tributaries, including lakes, rivers, streams (including intermittent streams), mudflats, sandflats, wetlands, sloughs, prairie potholes, wet meadows, playa lakes, natural ponds, and all impoundments of the foregoing, to the fullest extent that these waters, or activities affecting them, are subject to the legislative power of Congress under the Constitution.