Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2004