Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2004