Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2004