Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2004