Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/11/2003