Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/13/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/13/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/15/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/10/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/24/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/14/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/08/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/17/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/18/2004