Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/12/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/12/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/12/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/12/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/12/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/12/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/12/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/20/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/10/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/05/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/05/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/13/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/13/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/19/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/19/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/19/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/19/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/19/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/19/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/09/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/10/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/15/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/15/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/15/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/18/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/11/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/11/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/11/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/11/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/09/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/21/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/21/2004