Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/04/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/04/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/25/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/02/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 02/26/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/03/2004