There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Aerial Firefighter Relief Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to provide death and disability benefits for aerial firefighters who work on a contract basis for the Forest Service or an agency of the Department of the Interior and suffer death or disability in the line of duty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
09/29/2004Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/05/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/11/2003Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Resources
02/27/2003Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Referred to House Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E328)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/27/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/01/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/08/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/08/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/11/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/08/2004

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources02/27/2003 Referred to
09/29/2004 Hearings by
House Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/11/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands03/11/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power03/11/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans03/11/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health03/11/2003 Referred to
House Agriculture02/27/2003 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry03/11/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary02/27/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/05/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.977.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.977. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2003)

Aerial Firefighter Relief Act of 2003 - Amends the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to provide for death and disability benefits for aerial firefighters who serve the Forest Service or any agency of the Department of the Interior and suffer death or disability in the line of duty.

Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to provide for similar eligibility of aerial firefighters for public safety officer death benefits, applicable to a public agency.