Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/27/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/01/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/08/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/08/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/11/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/08/2004