Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/02/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/17/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/07/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/08/2004