Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/05/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/29/2004