There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

English Language Unity Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To declare English as the official language of the United States, to establish a uniform English language rule for naturalization, and to avoid mis-constructions of the English language texts of the laws of the United States, pursuant to Congress' powers to provide for the general welfare of the United States and to establish a uniform rule of naturalization under article I, section 8, of the Constitution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/05/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/13/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E464-466)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/07/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/07/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/09/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/11/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/04/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/09/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/09/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/21/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/21/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/24/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/25/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/30/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/30/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/08/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce02/27/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform03/24/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary02/27/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution05/05/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.997.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.997. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2003)

English Language Unity Act of 2003 - Amends specified Federal law to declare English to be the official language of the United States.

Gives representatives of the Federal Government an affirmative obligation to preserve and enhance the role of English as the official language of the Federal Government, including encouraging greater opportunities for individuals to learn the English language.

Requires the official functions of the United States (meaning, in this case, the States and the District of Columbia) to be conducted in English. Sets forth exceptions to and rules of construction for such requirements.

Requires a uniform English language rule for U.S. naturalization, and all naturalization ceremonies to be conducted in English.

Amends specified Federal law to declare, as a general rule of construction, that English language requirements and workplace policies, whether in the public or private sector, shall be presumptively consistent with the Laws of the United States.

Requires the Department of Justice to issue for public notice and comment a proposed rule for uniform testing of English language ability of candidates for naturalization, based upon the principles that: (1) all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of the Declaration of Independence, the Constitution, and the Laws of the United States; and (2) any exceptions to this standard should be limited to extraordinary circumstances, such as asylum.