Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/07/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/07/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/09/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/11/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/04/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/09/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/09/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/21/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/21/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/24/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/25/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/30/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/30/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/08/2004