Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/20/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/25/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/25/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/26/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2003