Text: H.Con.Res.104 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (04/02/2003)

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 104 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 104


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             March 21, 2003

                                Received

                             April 2, 2003

              Referred to the Committee on Armed Services

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Expressing the support and appreciation of the Nation for the President 
and the members of the Armed Forces who are participating in Operation 
                             Iraqi Freedom.

Whereas the United States Armed Forces, a total force comprised of active, 
        National Guard, and Reserve personnel, are now undertaking courageous 
        and determined operations against the forces of Saddam Hussein's regime;
Whereas the Senate and House of Representatives and the American people have the 
        greatest pride in the members of the Armed Forces and strongly support 
        them;
Whereas the Iraq Liberation Act of 1998 (Public Law 105-338) stated that it 
        should be the policy of the United States to support efforts to remove 
        the regime headed by Saddam Hussein from power in Iraq and to promote 
        the emergence of a democratic government to replace that regime;
Whereas on October 16, 2002, the President signed into law House Joint 
        Resolution 114 of the 107th Congress, the Authorization for Use of 
        Military Force Against Iraq Resolution of 2002 (Public Law 107-243), 
        which provides congressional authorization for the use of military force 
        against Iraq;
Whereas the United Nations Security Council, in Security Council Resolution 
        1441, adopted on November 8, 2002, voted unanimously that Iraq ``...will 
        face serious consequences as a result of its continued violations of its 
        obligations'' to disarm in accordance with all relevant United Nations 
        resolutions;
Whereas Iraq remains in material breach of the relevant United Nations 
        resolutions;
Whereas the United States has assembled and deployed an allied military 
        coalition to apply pressure on Saddam Hussein to comply with the 
        relevant United Nations resolutions;
Whereas on March 18, 2003, the President transmitted to the Speaker of the House 
        of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate the 
        President's determination, consistent with the Authorization for Use of 
        Military Force Against Iraq Resolution of 2002 (Public Law 107-243), 
        that reliance by the United States on further diplomatic and other 
        peaceful means alone will neither adequately protect the national 
        security of the United States against the continuing threat posed by 
        Iraq nor likely lead to enforcement of all relevant United Nations 
        Security Council resolutions regarding Iraq, and that the President's 
        use of military force against Iraq is consistent with necessary ongoing 
        efforts by the United States and other countries against international 
        terrorists and terrorist organizations, including those nations, 
        organizations, or persons who planned, authorized, committed, or aided 
        the terrorist attacks that occurred on September 11, 2001;
Whereas on the evening of March 17, 2003, the President of the United States 
        issued Saddam Hussein and his sons a final ultimatum to leave Iraq 
        within 48 hours or face United States military intervention;
Whereas, when Saddam Hussein failed to comply, the President ordered United 
        States Armed Forces to commence military operations against the forces 
        of Saddam Hussein during the evening of March 19, 2003, under the code 
        name of Operation Iraqi Freedom, in order to liberate Iraq, remove 
        Saddam Hussein from power, and neutralize Iraq's weapons of mass 
        destruction;
Whereas the United States Armed Forces and allied forces are performing their 
        missions with great courage and distinction in carrying out air, land, 
        and sea attacks against Iraqi military targets; and
Whereas the ability of the Armed Forces to successfully perform their mission 
        requires the support of their nation, community, and families: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That the Congress expresses the unequivocal support and appreciation of 
the Nation--
            (1) to the President as Commander-in-Chief for his firm 
        leadership and decisive action in the conduct of military 
        operations in Iraq as part of the on-going Global War on 
        Terrorism;
            (2) to the members of the United States Armed Forces 
        serving in Operation Iraqi Freedom, who are carrying out their 
        missions with excellence, patriotism, and bravery; and
            (3) to the families of the United States military personnel 
        serving in Operation Iraqi Freedom, who are providing support 
        and prayers for their loved ones currently engaged in military 
        operations in Iraq.

            Passed the House of Representatives March 21 (legislative 
      day, March 20), 2003.

            Attest:

                                                 JEFF TRANDAHL,

                                                                 Clerk.