There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Urging increased Federal funding for juvenile (Type 1) diabetes research.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/10/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/20/2003Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E534)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/03/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/24/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/16/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/20/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/10/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.107.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.107. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/2003)

Declares that Federal funding for diabetes research should be increased in accordance with the recommendations of the Diabetes Research Working Group so that a cure for juvenile diabetes can be found.