Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/25/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/25/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/25/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/25/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/25/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/27/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/01/2003