There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing sympathy for the loss of Rachel Corrie in the Palestinian village of Rafah in the Gaza Strip on March 16, 2003.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/25/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date Chamber
11/20/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/25/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
03/25/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/26/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/23/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/03/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/04/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/02/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/23/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/23/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations03/25/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.111.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.111. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/25/2003)

Expresses the sympathy of Congress to Craig and Cynthia Corrie and to their extended families, friends, and co-workers for the loss of Rachel Corrie in the Palestinian village of Rafah in the Gaza strip on March 16, 2003.

Calls on the U.S. Government to undertake a full investigation into her death.

Urges the U.S. Government and the Government of Israel to work together to determine the circumstances that led to her death and to ensure that an incident of this kind does not happen again.