Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/26/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/23/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/03/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/04/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/02/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/23/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/23/2004