Text: H.Con.Res.112 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/25/2003)

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 112 Introduced in House (IH)]






108th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 112

Condemning attacks on United States citizens by Palestinian terrorists, 
                        and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 25, 2003

   Mr. Crane (for himself, Mr. Lantos, Mr. Cantor, Mr. Ackerman, Mr. 
  Pence, Mr. Hoeffel, Mr. Ose, and Mr. Flake) submitted the following 
     concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
                        International Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Condemning attacks on United States citizens by Palestinian terrorists, 
                        and for other purposes.

Whereas since Yasser Arafat renounced violence in the Oslo Peace Accords on 
        September 13, 1993, at least 41 United States citizens, including one 
        unborn child, have been murdered by Palestinian terrorists;
Whereas on December 1, 1993, in a drive-by shooting north of Jerusalem, Hamas 
        killed United States citizen Yitzhak Weinstock, 19, whose family came 
        from Los Angeles;
Whereas on October 9, 1994, Hamas kidnapped and murdered United States citizen 
        Nachshon Wachsman, 19, whose family came from New York City;
Whereas on April 9, 1995, an Islamic Jihad bomb attack on a bus near Kfar Darom 
        killed United States citizen Alisa Flatow, 20, from West Orange, New 
        Jersey;
Whereas on August 21, 1995, in a Hamas bus bombing in Jerusalem, United States 
        citizen Joan Davenny, from New Haven, Connecticut, was killed;
Whereas on September 9, 1995, Mara Frey of Chicago was stabbed in Ma'ale 
        Michmash resulting in her unborn child's death;
Whereas on February 25, 1996, three United States citizens, Sara Duker of 
        Teaneck, New Jersey, Matthew Eisenfeld of West Hartford, Connecticut, 
        and Ira Weinstein of New York City, were killed in a Hamas bus bombing 
        in Jerusalem;
Whereas on May 13, 1996, United States citizen David Boim, 17, of New York City, 
        was killed in a drive-by shooting near Beit El, north of Jerusalem;
Whereas on June 9, 1996, United States citizen Yaron Ungar was killed in a drive 
        by-shooting near Beit Shemesh;
Whereas on July 30, 1997, United States citizen Leah Stern of Passaic, New 
        Jersey, was killed in a Hamas bombing in Jerusalem's Mahane Yehuda 
        market;
Whereas on September 4, 1997, a Hamas bombing on Ben-Yehuda Street, Jerusalem, 
        killed Yael Botwin, 14, of Los Angeles;
Whereas on April 19, 1998, an attack near the Israeli town of Maon killed United 
        States citizen Dov Dribben, 28;
Whereas on October 8, 2000, Rabbi Hillel Lieberman, 36, of New York City, was 
        stabbed and killed near Nablus;
Whereas on October 30, 2000, United States citizen Esh-Kodesh Gilmore, 25, was 
        shot in Jerusalem;
Whereas on December 31, 2000, Rabbi Binyamin Kahane, 34, and his wife, Talia 
        Hertzlich Kahane, both formerly of New York City, were killed in a 
        drive-by shooting near Ofra;
Whereas on May 9, 2001, Jacob ``Koby'' Mandell, 13, of Silver Spring, Maryland, 
        was killed in an attack near Tekoah;
Whereas on May 29, 2001, Sarah Blaustein, 53, of Lawrence, New York, was killed 
        in a drive-by shooting near Efrat;
Whereas on August 9, 2001, two United States citizens, Judith L. Greenbaum, 31, 
        and Malka Roth, 15, were killed in the Jerusalem Sbarro pizzeria 
        bombing;
Whereas on November 4, 2001, Shoshana Ben-Yishai, 16, of New York City, was shot 
        and killed during an attack on a Jerusalem bus;
Whereas on December 18, 2001, David Rubin, 44, and Asher ``Ruby'' Rubin, 3, of 
        New York City, were shot and killed on the Jerusalem-Shilo road;
Whereas on January 15, 2002, Avraham Boaz, 72, of New York City, was killed in a 
        shooting near Bethlehem;
Whereas on January 18, 2002, United States citizen Aaron Elis, 32, was killed in 
        a shooting in Hadera;
Whereas on February 15, 2002, United States citizen Lee Akunis, was shot and 
        killed near Ramallah;
Whereas on February 16, 2002, Keren Shatsky, 14, of New York City and Maine, and 
        Rachel Thaler, 16, of Baltimore, Maryland, were killed in a bombing in 
        Karnei Shomron;
Whereas on February 19, 2002, Moshe Saperstein of New York City was killed in a 
        shooting near Neve Dekalim;
Whereas on February 25, 2002, United States citizen Moran Amit, 25, was stabbed 
        and killed in Abu Tor Peace Forest, Jerusalem;
Whereas on March 24, 2002, Esther Kleinman, 23, formerly of Chicago, was shot 
        and killed near Ofra;
Whereas on March 27, 2002, United States citizen Hannah Rogen, 90, was killed in 
        a bombing at a hotel Passover seder in Netanya;
Whereas on June 18, 2002, Moshe Gottlieb, 70, of Los Angeles, was killed in a 
        bus bombing in Jerusalem;
Whereas on June 19, 2002, United States citizen Gila Sara Kessler, 19, was 
        killed in a bombing at a Jerusalem bus stop;
Whereas on July 31, 2002, five United States citizens were killed in a bombing 
        of a Hebrew University cafeteria: Marla Bennett, 24, of San Diego, 
        Benjamin Blutstein, 25, of Susquehanna Township, Pennsylvania, Janis 
        Ruth Coulter, 36, of Massachusetts, David Gritz, 24, of Peru, 
        Massachusetts (and of dual French-United States citizenship), and Dina 
        Carter, 37, of North Carolina;
Whereas on March 5, 2003, Abigail Leitel, 14, who was born in Lebanon, New 
        Hampshire, died in a bus bombing in Haifa;
Whereas at least another 74 United States citizens have been injured in 
        Palestinian terrorist attacks; and
Whereas the official Palestinian Authority television broadcast on March 14, 
        2003, of a live sermon calling for the destruction of the United States 
        and Israel was a blatant attempt to incite violence against United 
        States and Israeli citizens: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress--
            (1) condemns the attacks on United States citizens by 
        Palestinian terrorists and demands that the Palestinian 
        Authority work with Israel to protect all innocent individuals, 
        regardless of citizenship, from terrorist atrocities; and
            (2) offers its condolences to the families and loved ones 
        of United States citizens who were killed by Palestinian 
        terrorist attacks.
                                 <all>