Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/03/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/15/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/15/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/03/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/03/2003