Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/01/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/07/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/07/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/09/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/11/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/26/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/26/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/26/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/08/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/10/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/04/2004