Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/16/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/16/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/17/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 10/08/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/17/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/29/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/20/2004