Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/27/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/27/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/12/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/21/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/25/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/25/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/04/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/04/2004