Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/01/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/21/2003