There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the city of Dayton, Ohio, and its many partners, for hosting "Inventing Flight: The Centennial Celebration", a celebration of the centennial of Wilbur and Orville Wright's first flight.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/09/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 3 (Roll no. 250).(text: CR H5050)
05/06/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/10/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/09/2003-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 3 (Roll no. 250). (text: CR H5050)
06/09/2003-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/09/2003-6:50pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5054-55)
06/09/2003-2:21pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/09/2003-2:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 162.
06/09/2003-2:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5050-5052)
06/09/2003-2:11pmHouseMr. Turner (OH) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/22/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
05/22/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
05/06/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
05/06/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform05/06/2003 Referred to
05/22/2003 Markup by
Senate Judiciary06/10/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.162.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.162. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/09/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced on May 6, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors the city of Dayton, Ohio, and its many partners, for hosting "Inventing Flight: The Centennial Celebration," a celebration of the centennial of Wilbur and Orville Wright's first flight.