Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/18/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2003