Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/13/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/21/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/21/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/10/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/10/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/05/2004