Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/15/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/15/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/24/2003