Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/12/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/23/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/17/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/20/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/20/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/20/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/20/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/20/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/20/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/20/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/20/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 11/04/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/04/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/04/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/17/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/17/2003