Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/10/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/20/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/20/2004