Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/09/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/09/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/09/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/10/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/11/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/11/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/16/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/16/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/23/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/23/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/09/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/09/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/09/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/16/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/23/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/14/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/16/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/06/2004