There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the late Rick Lupe, lead forestry technician for the Bureau of Indian Affairs Fort Apache Agency, for his dedication and service to the United States and for his essential service in fighting wildfires and protecting the environment and communities of Arizona.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/04/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10304)
11/04/2003Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-343.
06/26/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
11/05/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
11/04/2003-4:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/04/2003-4:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10304)
11/04/2003-4:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 237.
11/04/2003-4:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10304-10305)
11/04/2003-4:50pmHouseMr. Renzi moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
11/04/2003HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
11/04/2003HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-343.
10/29/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/29/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/26/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
06/26/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/16/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources06/26/2003 Referred to
10/29/2003 Markup by
11/04/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-343
Senate Indian Affairs11/05/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.237.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.237. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/04/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors the late Rick Lupe (lead forestry technician for the Bureau of Indian Affairs' Fort Apache Agency) for his dedication and service to the United States, for his service in fighting wildfires and caring for the environment, and for ultimately sacrificing his life for the people of Arizona.