Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/14/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/14/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/02/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/30/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/30/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/30/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/20/2004