Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/04/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/23/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/24/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/15/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/15/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/15/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/21/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/28/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/28/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/28/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/29/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/06/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/20/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/28/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/11/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/10/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/16/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/17/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/09/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/16/2004