There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation and goals of "Hire a Veteran Week".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/24/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/22/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/25/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1615)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2003Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2003Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2003Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/24/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/24/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/25/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/04/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/04/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/02/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/02/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/08/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/08/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/24/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits08/22/2003 Referred to
House Armed Services07/24/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.252.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.252. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/2003)

Expresses support for designation of "Hire a Veteran Week." Encourages the President to issue a proclamation calling upon employers, labor organizations, veterans service organizations, and Federal, State, and local governmental agencies to lend their support to increase employment of men and women who have served in the armed forces.