Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/24/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/24/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/25/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/04/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/04/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/02/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/02/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/08/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/08/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2004