Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/13/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/13/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 02/13/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/13/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/04/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/12/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2003