Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/11/2004