There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing and congratulating the East Boynton Beach, Florida, Little League team as the 2003 United States Little League Champions.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/21/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S123)
10/15/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9400)
09/04/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/22/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/21/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S123)
10/16/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
10/15/2003-3:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/15/2003-3:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9400)
10/15/2003-2:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 273.
10/15/2003-2:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9400-9401)
10/15/2003-2:56pmHouseMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
09/25/2003HouseSubcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization Discharged.
09/25/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/25/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/16/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/04/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
09/04/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/04/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform09/04/2003 Referred to
09/25/2003 Markup by
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization09/16/2003 Referred to
09/25/2003 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/16/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.273.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.273. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (01/21/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the Little League team East Boynton Beach, Florida, for winning the United States Little League Championship. Invites the players, coaches, parents, and other league and city officials to the Capitol to be honored and requests that the President recognize the team.